California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2010

Amended

Bill May 28, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010
Bill April 13, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010