|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6707.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 6749.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 4875.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 5039.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|