LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2147
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2147
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2147
Compare Versions
AB2147 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB2147 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2147 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2147 Amended May 3, 2010
AB2147 Amended April 19, 2010
AB2147 Amended April 5, 2010
AB2147 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2147 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB2147 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2147 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2147 Amended May 3, 2010
AB2147 Amended April 19, 2010
AB2147 Amended April 5, 2010
AB2147 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare