|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 253, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4598.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5144.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 22. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|