BILL NUMBER: AB 2201CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 253 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 24, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 23, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 13, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 15, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 25, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Coto FEBRUARY 18, 2010 An act to amend Section 19596 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2201, Coto. Horse racing: harness racing: the Cane Pace. Existing law provides that the California Horse Racing Board may authorize a California harness racing association conducting a live racing meeting to accept wagers on the full card of races conducted by another racing association on the day that other association conducts the Breeder's Crown Stakes, the Meadowlands Pace, the Hambletonian, the Kentucky Futurity, or the North American Cup. This bill would authorize the board to permit a California harness racing association conducting a live racing meeting to accept wagers on the full card of races conducted by another racing association on the day that other association conducts the Cane Pace. The bill would also make technical, nonsubstantive changes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 19596 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 19596. (a) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the board may do any of the following: (1) Authorize a licensed harness racing association that is conducting a live racing meeting in this state to accept wagers on the full card of races conducted by another racing association on the day that other association conducts the Breeders' Crown Stakes, the Meadowlands Pace, the Hambletonian, the Cane Pace, the Kentucky Futurity, or the North American Cup. (2) Authorize a licensed quarter horse racing association that is conducting a live racing meeting in this state to accept wagers on races conducted by the racing association that conducts the American Quarter Horse Racing Challenge, if the races are conducted on the same day as the American Quarter Horse Racing Challenge. (3) Authorize the inclusion of wagers authorized pursuant to this section in the parimutuel pools of the out-of-state association that conducts the races on which the wagers are placed. (b) The board authorization may be granted under this section only if both of the following conditions are met: (1) The authorization complies with federal laws, including, but not limited to, Chapter 57 (commencing with Section 3001) of Title 15 of the United States Code. (2) Wagering is offered only within the racing enclosure and only within seven days of the running of the out-of-state race.