|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 28). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 7). From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1821.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1737.).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (May 20).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|