LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB222
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB222
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB222
Compare Versions
AB222 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB222 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB222 Amended August 31, 2010
AB222 Amended August 30, 2010
AB222 Amended August 20, 2010
AB222 Amended July 15, 2010
AB222 Amended July 8, 2009
AB222 Amended May 28, 2009
AB222 Amended May 5, 2009
AB222 Amended April 14, 2009
AB222 Introduced February 4, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB222 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB222 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB222 Amended August 31, 2010
AB222 Amended August 30, 2010
AB222 Amended August 20, 2010
AB222 Amended July 15, 2010
AB222 Amended July 8, 2009
AB222 Amended May 28, 2009
AB222 Amended May 5, 2009
AB222 Amended April 14, 2009
AB222 Introduced February 4, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare