|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 315, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3356.)
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (September 10).
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 3230.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2224.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 1960.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 982.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 17).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 7.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|