LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB224
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB224
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB224
Compare Versions
AB224 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB224 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB224 Amended September 1, 2009
AB224 Amended August 25, 2009
AB224 Amended August 17, 2009
AB224 Amended June 2, 2009
AB224 Amended April 14, 2009
AB224 Amended March 25, 2009
AB224 Introduced February 4, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB224 Chaptered October 11, 2009
AB224 Enrolled September 21, 2009
AB224 Amended September 1, 2009
AB224 Amended August 25, 2009
AB224 Amended August 17, 2009
AB224 Amended June 2, 2009
AB224 Amended April 14, 2009
AB224 Amended March 25, 2009
AB224 Introduced February 4, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare