|
07/15/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 71, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 10:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4100.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 3816.)
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 11).
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|