LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB229
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB229
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB229
Compare Versions
AB229 Chaptered July 15, 2010
AB229 Enrolled June 30, 2010
AB229 Amended January 4, 2010
AB229 Amended April 14, 2009
AB229 Introduced February 5, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB229 Chaptered July 15, 2010
AB229 Enrolled June 30, 2010
AB229 Amended January 4, 2010
AB229 Amended April 14, 2009
AB229 Introduced February 5, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare