|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 614, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 6582.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 4792.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 4979.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|