LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2294
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2294
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2294
Compare Versions
AB2294 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2294 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB2294 Amended August 19, 2010
AB2294 Amended August 12, 2010
AB2294 Amended June 24, 2010
AB2294 Amended April 26, 2010
AB2294 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2294 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2294 Enrolled September 2, 2010
AB2294 Amended August 19, 2010
AB2294 Amended August 12, 2010
AB2294 Amended June 24, 2010
AB2294 Amended April 26, 2010
AB2294 Introduced February 18, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare