|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 432, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 57. Noes 10. Page 6942.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 1. Page 4825.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. (Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14).)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on EQ. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 31. Page 1982.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/06/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 8.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|