LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB231
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB231
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB231
Compare Versions
AB231 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB231 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB231 Amended August 20, 2010
AB231 Amended August 9, 2010
AB231 Amended June 23, 2010
AB231 Amended June 26, 2009
AB231 Amended June 18, 2009
AB231 Amended April 29, 2009
AB231 Introduced February 5, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB231 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB231 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB231 Amended August 20, 2010
AB231 Amended August 9, 2010
AB231 Amended June 23, 2010
AB231 Amended June 26, 2009
AB231 Amended June 18, 2009
AB231 Amended April 29, 2009
AB231 Introduced February 5, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare