|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 384, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6152.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4375.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., F. & I.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5345.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|