California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2327 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 21, 2010
Bill May 20, 2010
Bill May 4, 2010
Bill April 15, 2010
Bill April 12, 2010