|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 260, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 5. Page 4572.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 3. Page 5079.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 4931.).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|