California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2361 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/24/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2361CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 260 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 24, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 23, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 18, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 18, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 29, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Ruskin FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 12246 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to weights and measures. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2361, Ruskin. Weights and measures: inspection: fees. Existing law requires the sealer of a county to inspect and test weighing and measuring devices, as specified, that are used or sold in the county. Existing law also requires the sealer of a county to weigh or measure packages to determine whether they contain the amount represented, as provided. Existing law, until January 1, 2011, permits the board of supervisors of a county to charge fees to recover the costs of the county sealer to perform these duties. This bill would extend the authority of the board of supervisors of a county to charge fees to recover the costs of the county sealer, as provided, until January 1, 2013. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 12246 of the Business and Professions Code is amended to read: 12246. This article shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2013, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute that is enacted before January 1, 2013, deletes or extends that date.