|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 425, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 6286.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4488.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (August 2).
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 5135.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|