California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2010

Amended

Bill July 15, 2010
Bill April 12, 2010