|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., F. & I. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 0. Page 5341.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 21. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 7).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on INS. and G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|