California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 28, 2010
Bill June 21, 2010
Bill May 12, 2010
Bill April 8, 2010