|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 225, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2054.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1946.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|