California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB242 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 10, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 4, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill June 1, 2009
Bill April 21, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009