|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3159.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2157.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/23/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 1947.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD. In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 14).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|