LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB245
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB245
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB245
Compare Versions
AB245 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB245 Amended August 25, 2009
AB245 Amended July 1, 2009
AB245 Amended June 1, 2009
AB245 Amended April 27, 2009
AB245 Amended March 26, 2009
AB245 Introduced February 10, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB245 Enrolled September 11, 2009
AB245 Amended August 25, 2009
AB245 Amended July 1, 2009
AB245 Amended June 1, 2009
AB245 Amended April 27, 2009
AB245 Amended March 26, 2009
AB245 Introduced February 10, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare