|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4997.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(16) suspended. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4787.) Senate Rule 29.3 suspended.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Strickland.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5050.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|