California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2530 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill August 25, 2010
Bill August 19, 2010
Bill April 8, 2010