|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6801.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Passed on file.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 17 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 4488.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 5488.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D., L. GOV. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|