California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2010

Amended

Bill August 3, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill April 29, 2010
Bill April 20, 2010