|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6687.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4827.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5475.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 19).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|