California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2543 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Amended

Bill August 16, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill April 28, 2010