|
07/09/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 64, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:15 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 4056.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5087.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 20.)
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|