California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2619 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill June 25, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 9, 2010

Amended

Bill April 28, 2010
Bill April 6, 2010