|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5161.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J.,E.D., & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|