California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2627 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Amended

Bill July 15, 2010
Bill July 1, 2010
Bill June 17, 2010
Bill April 8, 2010