California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2629 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 12, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 16, 2010
Bill April 26, 2010