LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2629
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2629
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2629
Compare Versions
AB2629 Chaptered August 27, 2010
AB2629 Enrolled August 12, 2010
AB2629 Amended June 16, 2010
AB2629 Amended April 26, 2010
AB2629 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2629 Chaptered August 27, 2010
AB2629 Enrolled August 12, 2010
AB2629 Amended June 16, 2010
AB2629 Amended April 26, 2010
AB2629 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare