California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 28, 2010