California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2696 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/27/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2696CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 396 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 27, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 25, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 24, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 28, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bass FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Sections 15002 and 15003 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to workforce investment. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2696, Bass. California Workforce Investment Board: Green Collar Jobs Council. Existing law establishes the California Workforce Investment Board , and requires the board to establish a committee known as the Green Collar Jobs Council (GCJC), comprised of specified members. Existing law requires the GCJC to perform certain functions and duties, including the development of a strategic initiative, relating to the training and development of a skilled workforce to meet the needs of California's emerging green economy. This bill would revise the duties of the GCJC, as specified. The bill would authorize the board to accept any revenues, moneys, grants, goods, or services from federal and state entities, philanthropic organizations, and other sources, to be used for purposes relating to the administration and implementation of the strategic initiative. The bill would authorize the Employment Development Department, upon appropriation by the Legislature, to expend those moneys and revenues for purposes related to the strategic initiative and the award of grants, as provided. The bill would require the GCJC to consult with appropriate state and local agencies to identify opportunities to coordinate the award of grant and green workforce training funds received by the state under the federal American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 or any other funding sources. The bill would require the board, on or before April 1, 2011, and annually each April 1 thereafter, to report to the Legislature on the status of GCJC activities, grants awarded, and the development and implementation of a green workforce strategic initiative. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 15002 of the Unemployment Insurance Code is amended to read: 15002. (a) The California Workforce Investment Board (CWIB) shall establish a special committee known as the Green Collar Jobs Council (GCJC), comprised of the appropriate representatives from the CWIB existing membership, including the K-12 representative, the California Community Colleges representative, the Business, Transportation and Housing Agency representative, the Employment Development Department representative, and other appropriate members. The GCJC may consult with other state agencies, other higher education representatives, local workforce investment boards, and industry representatives as well as philanthropic, nongovernmental, and environmental groups, as appropriate, in the development of a strategic initiative. (b) As part of the strategic initiative, the GCJC shall focus on developing the framework, funding, strategies, programs, policies, partnerships, and opportunities necessary to address the growing need for a highly skilled and well-trained workforce to meet the needs of California's emerging green economy. The GCJC shall do all of the following: (1) Assist in identifying and linking green collar job opportunities with workforce development training opportunities in local workforce investment areas (LWIAs), encouraging regional collaboration among LWIAs to meet regional economic demands. (2) Align workforce development activities with regional economic recovery and growth strategies. (3) Develop public, private, philanthropic, and nongovernmental partnerships to build and expand the state's workforce development programs, network, and infrastructure. (4) Provide policy guidance for job training programs for the clean and green technology sectors to help them prepare specific populations, such as at-risk youth, displaced workers, veterans, formerly incarcerated individuals, and others facing barriers to employment. (5) Develop, collect, analyze, and distribute statewide and regional labor market data on California's new and emerging green industries workforce needs, trends, and job growth. (6) Collaborate with community colleges and other educational institutions, registered apprenticeship programs, business and labor organizations, and community-based and philanthropic organizations to align workforce development services with strategies for regional economic growth. (7) Identify funding resources and make recommendations on how to expand and leverage these funds. (8) Foster regional collaboratives in the green economic sector. (c) The CWIB may accept any revenues, moneys, grants, goods, or services from federal and state entities, philanthropic organizations, and other sources, to be used for purposes relating to the administration and implementation of the strategic initiative, as described in subdivision (b). The CWIB shall also ensure the highest level of transparency and accountability and make information available on the CWIB Internet Web site. (d) Upon appropriation by the Legislature, the department may expend the moneys and revenues received pursuant to subdivision (c) for purposes related to the administration and implementation of the strategic, and for the award of workforce training grants implementing the strategic initiative. SEC. 2. Section 15003 of the Unemployment Insurance Code is amended to read: 15003. (a) On or before April 1, 2011, and annually each April 1 thereafter, the CWIB shall report to the Legislature on the status of GCJC activities, grants awarded, and its development and implementation of a green workforce strategic initiative. (b) The GCJC shall also consult with the appropriate state and local agencies to identify opportunities to coordinate the award of grant and green workforce training funds received by the state under the federal American Recovery and Reinvestment Act of 2009 (Public Law 111-5) or any other funding sources.