|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 270, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 70. Noes 1. Page 6926.)
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 2. Page 5007.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 4960.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 67. Noes 3. Page 5474.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 8).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|