LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2699
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2699
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2699
Compare Versions
AB2699 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB2699 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB2699 Amended August 27, 2010
AB2699 Amended August 2, 2010
AB2699 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2699 Amended May 12, 2010
AB2699 Amended April 26, 2010
AB2699 Amended April 14, 2010
AB2699 Amended April 5, 2010
AB2699 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2699 Chaptered September 24, 2010
AB2699 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB2699 Amended August 27, 2010
AB2699 Amended August 2, 2010
AB2699 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2699 Amended May 12, 2010
AB2699 Amended April 26, 2010
AB2699 Amended April 14, 2010
AB2699 Amended April 5, 2010
AB2699 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare