|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 95, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1663.)
|
|
|
|
06/28/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 25).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1471.)
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 6).
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/13/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 15.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|