California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB271 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/06/2009

 BILL NUMBER: AB 271CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 95 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 6, 2009 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR AUGUST 5, 2009 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 9, 2009 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Solorio FEBRUARY 12, 2009 An act to amend Sections 9801, 9802.5, and 9808 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment development. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 271, Solorio. California YouthBuild Program: funding and designation. Existing law establishes the California YouthBuild Program and authorizes the director of the Employment Development Department to make grants to eligible applicants, as provided, for specified purposes. Existing law also authorizes the director to contract with qualified nonprofit organizations to provide technical assistance to YouthBuild programs. Existing law also authorizes the director to contract with qualified nonprofit organizations to provide technical assistance to YouthBuild programs. Existing law allows the department to accept proposals for funding from applicants who establish their eligibility, as provided, by submitting proof that they have been funded or designated as a federal YouthBuild program by the Department of Housing and Urban Development, and restricts the use of the term "YouthBuild" to programs funded pursuant to the California YouthBuild Program. This bill, in conformity with the federal YouthBuild Transition Act of 2005 that transferred the administration of the YouthBuild program from the Department of Housing and Urban Development to the Department of Labor, would revise those provisions that make reference to the Department of Housing and Urban Development to refer instead to the Department of Labor. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 9801 of the Unemployment Insurance Code is amended to read: 9801. (a) The director, from funds appropriated for this purpose to the YouthBuild Program, may make grants to applicants for the purpose of carrying out programs as authorized by this article. For the purpose of administering and managing the grant-making process, the director may contract with a qualified nonprofit corporation designated by the United States Department of Labor to provide technical assistance to YouthBuild programs. All programs shall have strong youth and community involvement. (b) For purposes of this article, the following terms have the following meaning: (1) "YouthBuild Program" means the overall California YouthBuild Program, as coordinated by the director. (2) "Program" means an individual program funded by a grant made by the director to an applicant as part of the overall YouthBuild Program. (c) "Applicant" means an entity that applies for a program grant pursuant to Section 9807. (d) "Participant" means a person eligible to participate in a program pursuant to Section 9805. SEC. 2. Section 9802.5 of the Unemployment Insurance Code is amended to read: 9802.5. The department may accept proposals for funding from applicants who establish their eligibility for funding under this article by submitting proof that they have been funded or designated as a federal YouthBuild program by the United States Department of Labor. SEC. 3. Section 9808 of the Unemployment Insurance Code is amended to read: 9808. The term "YouthBuild" shall only be used in connection with a program funded pursuant to this article or by the United States Department of Labor, or if the program is an affiliate of YouthBuild U.S.A.