|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 692, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6713.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6645.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4828.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 29. Page 5515.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 42. Noes 21. Page 5340.).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee April 1.
|
|
|
|
03/01/2010
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|