LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2774
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2774
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2774
Compare Versions
AB2774 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2774 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB2774 Amended August 19, 2010
AB2774 Amended August 10, 2010
AB2774 Amended May 28, 2010
AB2774 Amended April 14, 2010
AB2774 Amended April 8, 2010
AB2774 Introduced March 1, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2774 Chaptered September 30, 2010
AB2774 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB2774 Amended August 19, 2010
AB2774 Amended August 10, 2010
AB2774 Amended May 28, 2010
AB2774 Amended April 14, 2010
AB2774 Amended April 8, 2010
AB2774 Introduced March 1, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare