|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 344, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 11:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6417.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4573.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2058.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (March 24).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|