LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB302
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB302
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB302
Compare Versions
AB302 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB302 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB302 Amended June 22, 2010
AB302 Amended January 21, 2010
AB302 Amended June 1, 2009
AB302 Introduced February 17, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
AB302 Chaptered September 27, 2010
AB302 Enrolled August 30, 2010
AB302 Amended June 22, 2010
AB302 Amended January 21, 2010
AB302 Amended June 1, 2009
AB302 Introduced February 17, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare