|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 433, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6792.) (Corrected September 9.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6732.) From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6691.) From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Re-referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR. pursuant to Asssembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6608.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/09/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1440.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 1354.).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 20.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|